MN HF840 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medical assistance adult dental coverage expanded to include periodontal disease nonsurgical treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical assistance adult dental coverage expanded to include periodontal disease nonsurgical treatment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-02-28HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1542 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Author added Marty

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback