MN HF832 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Author added Frazier
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Author added Frazier
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lottery prize winner name made private.
Title
Lottery prize winner name made private.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Author added Frazier |
2021-04-26 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2021-04-26 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF151 |
2021-03-23 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF151 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Secretary of State, Filed