MN HF826 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Poston
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Poston
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans; a resolution urging the President to designate a state funeral for the last World War II Medal of Honor recipient.
Title
Veterans; a resolution urging the President to designate a state funeral for the last World War II Medal of Honor recipient.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] | Rep. Anne Claflin [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] |
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-03-07 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Lillie, Heinrich, and Fabian |
2019-02-11 | House | Authors added Dettmer and Brand |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF524 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy