MN HF81 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author changed Bahner (as chief author)
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author changed Bahner (as chief author)
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Board of Pharmacy requested to establish pharmacogenomics (PGx) task force, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota Board of Pharmacy requested to establish pharmacogenomics (PGx) task force, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Author changed Bahner (as chief author) |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Bahner |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Pierson |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF248 (Similar To) 2021-01-21 - Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy