MN HF809 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Identity theft crime technical change made.
Title
Identity theft crime technical change made.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huot [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 25 | |
2021-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-05-25 | Governor approval | |
2021-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-05-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-05-16 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF104 |
2021-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF104 on General Orders |
2021-05-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-05-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-05-14 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Third reading |
2021-05-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 14, 2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF104 (Similar To) 2021-05-16 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF809