MN HF799 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Sandstede
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Sandstede
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Family Investment Program (MFIP) transitional standard increased.
Title
Minnesota Family Investment Program (MFIP) transitional standard increased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Sandstede |
2019-03-18 | House | Authors added Mann, Lee, Hornstein, and Bierman |
2019-03-14 | House | Authors added Lillie, Huot, Bernardy, and Xiong, J. |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Noor |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Schultz |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF905 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Author added Clausen