MN HF792 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Author added Masin
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Author added Masin
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans resilience project grant funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Veterans resilience project grant funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Author added Masin |
2021-04-15 | House | Author added Bahner |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Huot |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2102 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Author added Newton