MN HF780 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Author added Pfarr
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Author added Pfarr
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing support bed moratorium modified.
Title
Housing support bed moratorium modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Author added Pfarr |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Albright |
2021-02-17 | House | Division action, return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventing Homelessness Division |
2021-02-11 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2021-02-08 | House | Authors added Hanson, J., and Christensen |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1468 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Author added Port