MN HF78 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Authors added Acomb and Christensen
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Perfluorochemicals defined as hazardous substance under Minnesota Environment Response and Liability Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Perfluorochemicals defined as hazardous substance under Minnesota Environment Response and Liability Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28HouseAuthors added Acomb and Christensen
2021-01-21HouseAuthors added Freiberg, Lippert, Jordan, Huot, Bierman, and Morrison
2021-01-19HouseAuthors added Schultz and Franke
2021-01-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF156 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback