MN HF772 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public building accessibility requirements modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public building accessibility requirements modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseReferred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Labor
2019-02-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF937 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback