MN HF770 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Day care initial licensure requirement modified; commissioner of human services directed to implement child care provider communication process, develop plain-language handbook, and a uniform family day care provider application; child care tax credits modified; report required; and money appropriated.
Title
Day care initial licensure requirement modified; commissioner of human services directed to implement child care provider communication process, develop plain-language handbook, and a uniform family day care provider application; child care tax credits modified; report required; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |