MN HF766 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Medical cannabis and industrial hemp requirements modified, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical cannabis and industrial hemp requirements modified, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Loeffler
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-11HouseAuthor added Dehn
2019-02-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1070 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Comm report: Amended, No recommendation, re-referred to E-12 Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback