MN HF763 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Bierman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medical assistance excess income standard for persons who are elderly, blind, or have disabilities increase phased in.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical assistance excess income standard for persons who are elderly, blind, or have disabilities increase phased in.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Masin
2019-03-25HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-13HouseAuthors added Bernardy and Backer
2019-02-25HouseReferred by Chair to Long-Term Care Division
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Lillie
2019-02-11HouseAuthors added Xiong, T. and Brand
2019-02-07HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF949 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback