MN HF752 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Military and veterans affairs budget established; policy and technical changes made to various military and veterans affairs provisions including provisions related to the adjutant general, housing, veterans benefits, and veterans services; deferred prosecutions allowed; data classified; military code changes made; requirements and qualifications modified; jurisdictional and appellate changes made; punishable offenses provided; penalties provided; and money appropriated.
Title
Military and veterans affairs budget established; policy and technical changes made to various military and veterans affairs provisions including provisions related to the adjutant general, housing, veterans benefits, and veterans services; deferred prosecutions allowed; data classified; military code changes made; requirements and qualifications modified; jurisdictional and appellate changes made; punishable offenses provided; penalties provided; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Xiong, T. |
2021-04-06 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF722 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Second reading