MN HF750 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Authors added Boe, Petersburg, and Daniels
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Authors added Boe, Petersburg, and Daniels
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deer license revenue increase dedicated to deer management account.
Title
Deer license revenue increase dedicated to deer management account.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
Rep. Nolan West [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Authors added Boe, Petersburg, and Daniels |
2019-02-07 | House | Authors added Nornes, Poston, and West |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF527 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance