MN HF748 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-10)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Xiong, J. and Daniels
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Parental contribution fees for services for children with disabilities eliminated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental contribution fees for services for children with disabilities eliminated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthors added Xiong, J. and Daniels
2019-03-21HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Carlson, L.
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Pierson
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Her
2019-03-04HouseAuthors added Noor and Lee
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Moran and Richardson
2019-02-14HouseAuthors added Lucero and Pryor
2019-02-11HouseAuthors added Schultz, Olson, and Hornstein
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Freiberg and Baker
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF480 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Author added Bigham

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback