MN HF748 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Secretary of State Chapter 27 04/29/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Secretary of State Chapter 27 04/29/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prompt wage payment requirements and penalties modified.
Title
Prompt wage payment requirements and penalties modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Secretary of State Chapter 27 04/29/13 | |
2013-04-29 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-04-29 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2013-04-25 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-04-25 | House | Returned from Senate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 60-2 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Special Order |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF602 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF602, now on General Orders |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-11 | House | Bill was passed vote: 131-0 |
2013-04-11 | House | Third reading |
2013-04-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2013-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law |
2013-03-04 | House | Author added Schoen |
2013-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Workplace and Regulated Industries |