MN HF741 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Money bail use for certain offenses limited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Money bail use for certain offenses limited.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseSecond reading
2020-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Her
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Morrison and Elkins
2019-02-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Dehn
2019-02-11HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Richardson, Hassan, Gomez, Lippert, and Mahoney
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF878 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Author added Marty

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback