MN HF739 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Becker-Finn
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Court time limit for hearing petitions for post-conviction relief modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court time limit for hearing petitions for post-conviction relief modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Becker-Finn
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Edelson
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Noor
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Xiong, J.
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Dehn
2019-02-11HouseAuthor added Persell
2019-02-07HouseAuthor added Lesch
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF2495 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback