MN HF73 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pupils enrolled in career and technical education courses extended time use expanded.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupils enrolled in career and technical education courses extended time use expanded.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseReferred by Chair to Education Finance Division
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Dettmer
2019-01-17HouseAuthor added Bennett
2019-01-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF505 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback