MN HF73 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - House: Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - House: Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
General fund money transfer to state airports fund required.
Title
General fund money transfer to state airports fund required.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Beard [R] | Rep. Robin Brown [D] | Rep. Julie Bunn [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. David Dill [D] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] | Rep. Steve Gottwalt [R] | Rep. Larry Haws [D] |
Rep. Melissa Hortman [D] | Rep. Lawrence Hosch [D] | Rep. Larry Howes [R] | Rep. Alan Juhnke [D] |
Rep. Bernie Lieder [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Terry Morrow [D] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] |
Rep. David Olin [D] | Sen. Roger Reinert [D] | Rep. Brita Sailer [D] | Rep. Dan Severson [R] |
Rep. John Ward [D] | Rep. Andy Welti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-06 | House: Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division | |
2009-02-02 | House: Author added Hosch | |
2009-01-29 | House: Authors added Brown and Dettmer | |
2009-01-26 | House: Author added Dill | |
2009-01-20 | House: Division action, to pass and return to Finance | |
2009-01-15 | House: Authors added Hortman and Morrow | |
2009-01-12 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance | |
2009-01-12 | House: Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF0073&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF0073.0.pdf |