MN HF728 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to State Government Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to State Government Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans support funding provided including support for domestic abuse prevention, mental health services, chemical abuse treatment, veterans homelessness prevention, compensation to honor guards, and veterans courts; veterans nursing home tax credit provided; and money appropriated.
Title
Veterans support funding provided including support for domestic abuse prevention, mental health services, chemical abuse treatment, veterans homelessness prevention, compensation to honor guards, and veterans courts; veterans nursing home tax credit provided; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Duane Sauke [D] |
Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to State Government Finance |
2017-02-09 | House | Author added Maye Quade. |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans Affairs Division |
2017-02-02 | House | Author added Becker-Finn and Sauke. |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF719 (Similar To) 2017-02-06 - Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy