MN HF723 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
African American Youth Access and African Immigrant Family Outreach grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
African American Youth Access and African Immigrant Family Outreach grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Frazier |
2021-02-18 | House | Author added Hassan |
2021-02-11 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1207 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Author added Pappas