MN HF722 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Drazkowski
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Drazkowski
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Combined net receipts tax rate reduction and lawful purpose expenditure deduction provided.
Title
Combined net receipts tax rate reduction and lawful purpose expenditure deduction provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Shane Mekeland [R] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Drazkowski |
2019-02-18 | House | Authors added Munson and Davids |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF876 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Taxes