MN HF721 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Bierman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Insecticide use in wildlife management areas prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insecticide use in wildlife management areas prohibited.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Bahner
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Lesch
2019-02-27HouseAuthors added Tabke and Vang
2019-02-25HouseAuthors added Carlson, L.; Dehn; Wolgamott; and Koegel
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Xiong, J.; Richardson; Olson; Lislegard; Davnie; Lippert; and Her
2019-02-21HouseSecond reading
2019-02-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-02-11HouseAuthors added Kunesh-Podein and Huot
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Fischer, Wagenius, Sundin, Persell, Morrison, Becker-Finn, Sandell, Claflin, and Xiong, T.
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF941 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Withdrawn and returned to author

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback