MN HF72 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-17 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-17 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individual income tax and corporate franchise tax refunds modified, and refunds required to include interest calculated on payments of estimated tax.
Title
Individual income tax and corporate franchise tax refunds modified, and refunds required to include interest calculated on payments of estimated tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-17 | House | Author added Scott |
2023-01-11 | House | Author added Anderson, P. E. |
2023-01-09 | House | Author added Koznick |
2023-01-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |