MN HF72 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Boe
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Boe
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced standard time/daylight saving time provided year-round effective upon federal law authorization.
Title
Advanced standard time/daylight saving time provided year-round effective upon federal law authorization.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] |
Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Munson |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Nelson, M. |
2021-01-28 | House | Author added Demuth |
2021-01-19 | House | Authors added Stephenson, Garofalo, and Lucero |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF149 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Second reading