MN HF718 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cities authorized to adopt pesticide control ordinances.
Title
Cities authorized to adopt pesticide control ordinances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2021-03-18 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
2021-02-18 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1642 (Similar To) 2021-03-17 - Author added Murphy