MN HF717 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Secretary of State Chapter 35
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Secretary of State Chapter 35
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Chanhassen; Trunk Highway 5 segment designated as Prince Rogers Nelson Memorial Highway, and Augie Mueller Memorial Highway modified.
Title
Chanhassen; Trunk Highway 5 segment designated as Prince Rogers Nelson Memorial Highway, and Augie Mueller Memorial Highway modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Secretary of State Chapter 35 | |
2023-05-09 | Governor's action Approval | |
2023-05-09 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2023-05-09 | Governor approval | |
2023-05-08 | Presented to Governor | |
2023-05-08 | House | Returned from Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF279 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF279, now on General Orders |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-04-24 | House | Author added Pryor |
2023-04-21 | House | Bill was passed |
2023-04-21 | House | Third reading |
2023-04-19 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 21, 2023 |
2023-04-17 | House | Second reading |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-01-30 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-01-25 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF279 (Similar To) 2023-04-25 - Author added Cwodzinski