MN HF716 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Access to shared services under home and community-based service waivers expanded.
Title
Access to shared services under home and community-based service waivers expanded.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-03-15 | House | Author added Hicks |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Bierman |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance |
2023-02-01 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2023-01-30 | House | Author added Curran |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF654 (Similar To) 2023-01-30 - Author added Kunesh