MN HF703 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Authors added Nelson and Hamilton
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Authors added Nelson and Hamilton
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Brewer's license holder allowed to operate on-sale facility.
Title
Brewer's license holder allowed to operate on-sale facility.
Sponsors
Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Kirk Stensrud [R] | Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] |
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Tara Mack [R] |
Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. Kelby Woodard [R] | Rep. Doug Wardlow [R] |
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House | Authors added Nelson and Hamilton |
2011-03-16 | House | Author added Wardlow |
2011-03-14 | House | Author added Woodard |
2011-03-03 | House | Author added Torkelson |
2011-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0703&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF703&version=0&session=ls87 |