MN HF703 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-26 - House: Referred by Chair to Health Care and Human Services Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-26 - House: Referred by Chair to Health Care and Human Services Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Long-term care provider rate adjustments provided, phase-in of rebased facility rates modified, funding provided for nursing facility moratorium exceptions and project extension approval, and human services commissioner required to develop recommendations on specialized care.
Title
Long-term care provider rate adjustments provided, phase-in of rebased facility rates modified, funding provided for nursing facility moratorium exceptions and project extension approval, and human services commissioner required to develop recommendations on specialized care.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Rep. Tom Anzelc [D] | Rep. Patti Fritz [D] | Rep. Lawrence Hosch [D] |
Rep. Terry Morrow [D] | Rep. Mary Ellen Otremba [D] | Rep. John Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-26 | House: Referred by Chair to Health Care and Human Services Finance Division | |
2009-02-23 | House: Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Finance | |
2009-02-19 | House: Author added Ward | |
2009-02-16 | House: Author added Morrow | |
2009-02-12 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Care and Human Services Policy and Oversight |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF0703&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF0703.0.pdf |