MN HF70 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State building energy conservation revolving loan account established, and money appropriated.
Title
State building energy conservation revolving loan account established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
2021-02-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Lippert |
2021-01-19 | House | Author added Reyer |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF543 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Author added Pappas