MN HF69 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Combined net receipts tax calculation modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Combined net receipts tax calculation modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Boe
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Haley
2019-02-07HouseAuthor added Lillie
2019-01-28HouseAuthor added Lien
2019-01-22HouseAuthor added Backer
2019-01-17HouseAuthor added Lueck
2019-01-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF219 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback