MN HF688 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Schools allowed to maintain a supply of epinephrine auto-injectors, and immunity from liability provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools allowed to maintain a supply of epinephrine auto-injectors, and immunity from liability provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-13HouseSecond reading
2013-03-13HouseCommittee report, to pass as amended
2013-03-07HouseAuthor added Woodard
2013-03-06HouseCommittee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2013-03-04HouseAuthors added Anderson, S.; Ward, J.E., and Zellers
2013-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback