MN HF684 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Mariani
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

University of Minnesota Board of Regents requested to establish advisory council on rare diseases, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Minnesota Board of Regents requested to establish advisory council on rare diseases, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Mariani
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Hornstein
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Stephenson
2019-03-13HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Masin
2019-03-07HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Government Operations
2019-03-07HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Klevorn
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Pryor, Zerwas, and Albright
2019-02-04HouseReferred by Chair to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF973 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Rules suspended Jt. rule 2.03

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback