MN HF682 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Bahner
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Disaster contingency account money transferred.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disaster contingency account money transferred.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseAuthor added Bahner
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Davids
2019-03-25HouseHF indefinitely postponed
2019-03-25HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF307
2019-03-20HouseSecond reading
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-03-06HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Poppe
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Gunther and Brand
2019-02-04HouseReferred by Chair to Greater Minnesota Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1116 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
SF307 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Secretary of State Chapter 6 04/01/2019

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback