MN HF681 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Mariani
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Mariani
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pregnant and parenting pupils transportation to qualified programs provided, reimbursement allowed, and money appropriated.
Title
Pregnant and parenting pupils transportation to qualified programs provided, reimbursement allowed, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-25 | House | Authors added Poppe, Long, and Moller |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Bernardy, Acomb, Hansen, Her, Hamilton, McDonald, and Xiong, J. |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF340 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Author added Marty