MN HF679 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Children's residential treatment payment provisions effective date amended, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's residential treatment payment provisions effective date amended, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12 Secretary of State Chapter 12
2019-04-12 Governor's action Approval
2019-04-12 Secretary of State, Filed
2019-04-12 Governor approval
2019-04-12 Presented to Governor
2019-04-12HouseReturned from Senate
2019-04-11SenateThird reading Passed
2019-04-11SenateSpecial Order
2019-04-10SenateSecond reading
2019-04-10SenateComm report: To pass
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Finance
2019-03-25SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-03-25SenateReceived from House
2019-03-21HouseBill was passed
2019-03-21HouseThird reading
2019-03-20HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 21, 2019
2019-03-13HouseSecond reading
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-07HouseMotion prevailed
2019-03-07HouseMotion to re-refer Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 11, 2019
2019-02-27HouseSecond reading
2019-02-27HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Schultz
2019-02-19HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-14HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-14HouseAuthors added Baker and Olson
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-11HouseAuthor added Backer
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1131 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - HF substituted in committee HF679

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback