MN HF676 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Landscape application contracts regulated, and exclusion provided.
Title
Landscape application contracts regulated, and exclusion provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed as amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed as amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 74 | |
2017-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2017-05-20 | Governor approval | |
2017-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-17 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 49-18 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third reading vote: 49-18 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-05-16 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-11 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 129-0 |
2017-05-11 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2017-05-11 | House | Motion prevailed |
2017-05-11 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2017-05-11 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-05-08 | House | Senate conferees Senjem, Dahms, Sparks |
2017-05-08 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2017-05-04 | House | House conferees Davids, Hoppe, Rosenthal |
2017-05-04 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2017-05-04 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate conferees Senjem; Dahms; Sparks |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | House conferees Davids; Hoppe; Rosenthal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed as amended vote: 65-0 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1445 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1445, now on General Orders |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 129-0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-04-20 | House | Amended |
2017-04-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 20, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1445 (Similar To) 2017-04-27 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF676