MN HF665 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-8)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Authors added Poppe and Scott
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Youth intervention programs funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth intervention programs funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseAuthors added Poppe and Scott
2019-02-14HouseAuthors added Marquart; Tabke; Koegel; Liebling; Xiong, T.; Stephenson; and Freiberg
2019-02-11HouseAuthor added Schultz
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Xiong, J.; Bennett; Gunther; and Mekeland
2019-02-04HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF904 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback