MN HF665 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Authors added Poppe and Scott
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Authors added Poppe and Scott
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Youth intervention program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Youth intervention program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Authors added Poppe and Scott |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Marquart; Tabke; Koegel; Liebling; Xiong, T.; Stephenson; and Freiberg |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Schultz |
2019-02-07 | House | Authors added Xiong, J.; Bennett; Gunther; and Mekeland |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF904 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy