MN HF660 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Fischer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Fischer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Dignity in Pregnancy and Childbirth Act established, anti-racism training and implicit bias continuing education required, commissioner of health maternal death studies expanded to include maternal morbidity, and money appropriated.
Title
Dignity in Pregnancy and Childbirth Act established, anti-racism training and implicit bias continuing education required, commissioner of health maternal death studies expanded to include maternal morbidity, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Fischer |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Her |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Boldon |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-02-15 | House | Authors added Moller, Bernardy, Bahner and Huot |
2021-02-11 | House | Authors added Olson, L.; Edelson; and Stephenson |
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Hassan |
2021-02-08 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn, Youakim, and Morrison |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF877 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Author added McEwen