MN HF65 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Author added Bly.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Author added Bly.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Corporations with high principal executive officer to median worker pay ratios surtax imposed.
Title
Corporations with high principal executive officer to median worker pay ratios surtax imposed.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
Rep. David Bly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Author added Bly. |
2017-01-11 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2017-01-09 | House | Authors added Dehn, R., and Loeffler. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |