MN HF641 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military veteran jobs tax credit provided.
Title
Military veteran jobs tax credit provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Raleigh [R] | Rep. Brian Pfarr [R] | Rep. Bjorn Olson [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Susan Akland [R] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Poston, Akland, and Reyer |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Berg |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF683 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Author added Hawj