MN HF638 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Author added Fenton.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Author added Fenton.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle part sale revenue allocated to the highway user tax distribution fund.
Title
Motor vehicle part sale revenue allocated to the highway user tax distribution fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Bob Loonan [R] |
Rep. Kelly Fenton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Author added Fenton. |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-02-01 | House | Author added Loonan. |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF990 (Similar To) 2017-03-14 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Transportation Finance and Policy