MN HF637 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health-related professions temporary license suspensions and background checks modified.
Title
Health-related professions temporary license suspensions and background checks modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 49 | |
2019-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-19 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF583 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF583, now on General Orders |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-04-08 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Third reading |
2019-04-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 08, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF583 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF637