MN HF626 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Fischer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Fischer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rare disease diagnosis and treatment unrestricted services access required.
Title
Rare disease diagnosis and treatment unrestricted services access required.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] |
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] |
Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Author added Fischer |
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Masin |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Boldon and Feist |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Bierman |
2022-02-24 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn and Davids |
2022-02-03 | House | Author added Lillie |
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Mariani and Theis |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Jurgens, Youakim, Lee and Her |
2021-02-18 | House | Authors added Huot and Jordan |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Baker |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF464 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Author added Isaacson