MN HF625 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Author added Koznick
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Author added Koznick
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community Cooks program at Appetite for Change funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Community Cooks program at Appetite for Change funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Koznick |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Urdahl |
2021-02-08 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF601 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Author added Dziedzic