MN HF618 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added West
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added West
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School district equalized referendum levies calculation modified.
Title
School district equalized referendum levies calculation modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Author added West |
2019-03-27 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Lucero |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF670 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes